Trustees 1ST INKPEN AND KINTBURY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1036011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HUNT | Chair | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Reed | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Mark Gomez | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Gomez | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Francis Reeves | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Edward Marston | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Charles Lee Mr | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Ogilvy | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARY EVELINE OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUZANNE CLARE REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR IVAN OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.