NOAH'S ARK PRE-SCHOOL (WERRINGTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care of children from 2 1/2 years to 4 years. Situated in Werrington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 15 April 1994: Standard registration
- 09 May 2022: Funds received from 1020097 EYE PRE-SCHOOL
- LOXLEY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zara Brencs | Chair | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Ruscillo | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Garford | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Weaver | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Trina Senese | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Michelle Draper | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.58k | £63.47k | £78.95k | £78.47k | £62.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.68k | £88.62k | £77.42k | £76.61k | £71.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 23 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
WERRINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOXLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE
LOXLEY
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 5BW
- Phone:
- 07951213798
- Email:
- noahsarkpreschool@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window