BIRKENSHAW C E (C) FIRST AND NURSERY SCHOOL P T A

Charity number: 1036121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We hold fundraising events to raise money to benefit the school children in both fun and educational activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £14,181
Total expenditure: £10,832

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Birkenshaw CE (C) Primary School PTA (Working name)
  • BIRKENSHAW COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria McGrann Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Rebecca Martin Trustee 09 September 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.82k £6.19k £17.38k £14.76k £14.18k
Total expenditure £5.76k £9.32k £9.83k £14.01k £10.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Birkenshaw C E (C) Primary School
Station Lane
Birkenshaw
BRADFORD
BD11 2JE
Phone:
01274651232