FRIENDS OF HOCKWOLD SITE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036202
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 09 January 2018 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required