FRIENDS OF HOCKWOLD SITE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036202
Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £3.95k £3.89k £4.08k £4.37k £7.43k
Total expenditure £6.29k £3.34k £5.95k £5.51k £5.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A