ASHLEY YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1036309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 July 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 July 2017 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required