ASTELLAS EUROPEAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1036344
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2017 On time