ASTELLAS EUROPEAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1036344
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £33.32k £31.24k £30.34k £10.33k £7.96k
Total expenditure £547.59k £943.71k £283.73k £36.82k £38.35k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A