SPITTAL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School Playgroup
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £8,945 from 2 government contract(s) and £4,564 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 14 April 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hana Whitton | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mary Chilvers | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Gibbens | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicky - Marie Williams | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH DONCASTER | Trustee | 01 September 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.34k | £25.86k | £33.15k | £31.95k | £21.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.63k | £15.34k | £24.77k | £33.96k | £28.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.04k | N/A | N/A | £10.69k | £8.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | £774 | £15.54k | £21.78k | £11.35k | £4.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN T804HROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Hall
Spittal
HAVERFORDWEST
Dyfed
SA62 5QT
- Phone:
- 01437741448
- Email:
- judith448@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window