Financial history 1ST FRAMEWORK

Charity number: 1036435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £48.68k £24.71k £27.86k £17.49k £1.08k
Total expenditure £48.17k £19.42k £27.56k £15.92k £3.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A