Financial history ZEPHANIAH MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1036478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £63.55k £91.48k £89.69k £82.25k £76.97k
Total expenditure £64.96k £77.99k £90.35k £78.12k £78.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A