HOLY TRINITY CHURCH OF ENGLAND V A SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £13.87k £12.31k £16.35k £18.56k £7.88k
Total expenditure £12.89k £2.81k £3.84k £18.51k £14.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A