Financial history THE CONGREGATION OF THE DAUGHTERS OF MARY MOTHER OF MERCY IN THE BRITISH ISLES
Charity number: 1036524
Charity reporting is overdue by 176 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £865.80k | £859.26k | £896.34k | £978.61k | £958.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £878.58k | £850.31k | £903.99k | £976.79k | £938.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £39.79k | £27.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.57k | £7.89k | £15.47k | £59.56k | £27.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £864.23k | £851.37k | £880.87k | £919.05k | £931.17k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £878.58k | £850.31k | £903.99k | £971.83k | £935.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £11.78k | £12.33k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.96k | £2.97k |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.