FRIENDS OF PARK ROAD SCHOOL(TIMPERLEY)

Charity number: 1036651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.54k £5.79k £6.02k £3.54k £1.57k
Total expenditure £2.47k £2.81k £3.20k £4.78k £10.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A