FRIENDS OF PARK ROAD SCHOOL(TIMPERLEY)
Charity number: 1036651
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for the benefit of the pupils and community of Park Road Academy Primary School, Timperley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Trafford
Governance
Registration history:
- 19 April 1994: Standard registration
- 20 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- TIMPERLEY, PARK ROAD SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.79k | £6.02k | £3.54k | £1.57k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £3.20k | £4.78k | £10.40k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 317 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 317 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 683 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 683 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 July 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Submit annual return
Open in new window
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 24 NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window