Financial history ABBEYMEAD UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1036654
Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £135.86k £111.71k £93.77k £95.91k £86.15k
Total expenditure £128.46k £110.67k £104.48k £84.30k £87.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £87.42k £76.35k N/A N/A