Financial history TRIMLEY ST MARTIN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036786
Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £4.30k £2.41k £3.17k £3.02k £4.32k
Total expenditure £3.08k £2.10k £2.09k £2.02k £4.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A