RAINBOW PRESCHOOL PLAYGROUP [BEDFORD]

Charity Number: 1036883
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A PRE-SCHOOL FOR 2 - 5 YEAR OLDS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 04 September 2021

Total income: £83,522
Total expenditure: £104,772

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 1994: Standard registration
  • 30 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
  • RAINBOW PLAYGROUP [BEDFORD] (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/09/2017 04/09/2018 04/09/2019 04/09/2020 04/09/2021
Total gross income £41.07k £55.28k £53.53k £63.70k £83.52k
Total expenditure £46.83k £49.66k £54.34k £52.77k £104.77k
Income from government contracts £30.06k £40.73k £41.64k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 September 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 04 September 2020 04 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2020 04 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 04 September 2019 12 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2019 12 February 2020 On Time
Annual return 04 September 2018 12 February 2020 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2018 12 February 2020 223 days late