BROWN EDGE BUSY BEE'S

Charity number: 1036896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £59.29k £80.43k £64.18k £75.07k £57.47k
Total expenditure £60.63k £65.71k £66.22k £67.21k £57.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £56.52k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A