BROWN EDGE BUSY BEE'S

Charity number: 1036896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROL ROWLEY Trustee 22 October 2019
BROWN EDGE BUSY BEES Recently registered
Barbara Owen Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Lorraine Pope Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Deborah Gratton Chair 04 January 2012
SANDY LANE CENTRE Received: On time
BROWN EDGE BUSY BEES Recently registered
KIMBERLEY SMITH Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
SUZANNE PASS Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
SHARON WHITE Trustee 29 September 1999
SANDY LANE CENTRE Received: On time
BROWN EDGE BUSY BEES Recently registered
DAWN EDWARDS-ROWLEY Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record