Financial history CONISTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036917
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £92.73k £111.11k £122.91k £115.11k £101.09k
Total expenditure £97.44k £97.99k £103.00k £119.06k £105.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.77k N/A N/A £6.00k £54.38k