KINGTON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1036974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 22 July 2020 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required