KINGTON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1036974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £5.65k £9.59k £2.68k £2.57k £3.07k
Total expenditure £6.98k £4.10k £17.23k £1.44k £2.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A