THE ST VINCENT DE PAUL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We hold annual Christmas and Summer Fairs. We host a quiz night every year for the parents. We organise a soup stop on Fireworks Night. We also stage discos and film nights for the children

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £15,371
Total expenditure: £12,487

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • St Vincent de Paul Catholic Primary School Parents and Staff Association (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Sansom Trustee 12 February 2019
None on record
Tracey Flynn Trustee 01 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.00k £9.56k £5.30k £8.21k £15.37k
Total expenditure £11.82k £8.49k £8.18k £5.44k £12.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 July 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Vincent de Paul Parent Staff Association
St. Vincent De Paul Primary School
Bedwell Crescent
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG1 1NJ
Phone:
07894500818