Accounts and annual returns THE WEST SOMERSET SINGERS

Charity number: 1037125
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required