Financial history THE WEST SOMERSET SINGERS

Charity number: 1037125
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £4.23k £5.14k £4.19k £0 £2.44k
Total expenditure £4.05k £3.64k £3.58k £187 £3.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A