TUNBRIDGE WELLS ST MARKS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037130
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 January 2020 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required