Financial history PIONEERS UK MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1037154
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.15m £1.20m £1.35m £1.30m £1.84m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.33m £1.40m £1.37m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £1.09m £1.22m £1.17m £1.70m
Income - Other trading activities £50.76k £94.30k £111.47k £112.64k £124.60k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £58.37k £67.70k
Income - Investment £7.86k £8.58k £12.45k £12.97k £11.23k
Income - Other £13.30k £10.11k £10.41k £1.06k £2.18k
Income - Legacies £70.77k £91.29k £108.75k £90.19k £429.13k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.22m £1.35m £1.32m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £189.75k £52.37k £50.52k £49.39k £49.63k
Expenditure - Governance £30.22k £42.07k £7.99k £24.86k £34.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £70.09k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.97k £0 £4.12k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £52.59k £0 £0 £0