Trustees PIONEERS UK MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1037154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JULIE RUTH HICKSON Chair
ACTION PARTNERS CORPORATION
Received: On time
Charles William Clayton Trustee 27 June 2020
ACTION PARTNERS CORPORATION
Received: On time
Rev Ebenezer Aryee Trustee 26 January 2019
GOODNEWS AID
Received: 94 days late
Dr SAM GORDON Mr Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
JENNY BARTHOW Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
Katy McConkey Trustee 07 November 2015
None on record
Dr C J Bignell Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
STEVE JENKINS Trustee 30 April 2015
EMMANUEL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (ASSEMBLIES OF GOD), THURNSCOE
Overdue by 1781 days
DAVID ROBERT MADDOCK Trustee
ACTION PARTNERS CORPORATION
Received: On time
MRS KATE REGISTER Trustee
FEBA RADIO
Received: On time
ACTION PARTNERS CORPORATION
Received: On time
PETER JOHN MADDOCK Trustee
ACTION PARTNERS CORPORATION
Received: On time
SOUTHGATE CHURCH BURY ST EDMUNDS SUFFOLK
Received: On time