Financial history WOODLAND SINGERS

Charity number: 1037234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £4.43k £4.92k £4.45k £4.22k £2.60k
Total expenditure £3.96k £5.75k £3.94k £4.37k £2.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A