THE SIDCOT BUILDING TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary purpose of the charity is to make grants to Sidcot School, Winscombe, Somerset for purchasing or erecting property for, or improving the property of the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
Governance
- 13 May 1994: Standard registration
- SIDCOT BUILDING TRUST FUND (Working name)
- THE SIDCOT BUILDING TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH JOHN KERTON | Chair | 12 March 1995 |
|
|
||||
Varut Dechpokket | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL GARDNER | Trustee | 03 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Edward Reynolds | Trustee | 31 March 1982 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.03k | £36.92k | £43.82k | £38.08k | £24.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £200.27k | £342 | £600.41k | £1.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/01/1959 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/03/1970 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/12/2014
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS TO SIDCOT SCHOOL FOR THE PURPOSE OF PURCHASING, ERECTING, ENLARGING, EXTENDING, ALTERING, IMPROVING, RENEWING, REPAIRING, MAINTAINING, OR OTHERWISE DEALING WITH NEW OR EXISTING BUILDINGS, PLAYGROUNDS, GARDENS, PLAYING FIELDS OR OTHER LAND TO FORM OR FORMING PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SIDCOT SCHOOL, WINSCOMBE, AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Gillham Wood Road
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
TN39 3BN
- Phone:
- 01424842447
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window