Accounts and annual returns CULLODEN BANGLADESHI PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037495
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 July 2022 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 July 2021 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 July 2021 519 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 July 2021 519 days late Download Open in new window