Financial history CULLODEN BANGLADESHI PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037495
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £27.12k £30.80k £9.04k £0 £0
Total expenditure £22.24k £24.10k £19.51k £8.06k £3.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.02k £19.95k N/A N/A N/A