Financial history CUTNALL GREEN YOUNG FARMERS'CLUB

Charity number: 1037602
Charity reporting is overdue by 380 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £9.44k £27.78k £22.38k £20.32k £11.65k
Total expenditure £4.89k £36.11k £14.98k £17.33k £7.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A