BILLERICAY CATHOLIC PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1037616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 July 2020 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 July 2020 25 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2017 On time Download