BILLERICAY CATHOLIC PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1037616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexandra Venables Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
Emma Dawson Trustee 13 January 2021 None on record
Sophie Kelly Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
Hayley Dear Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
Billie Foyle Trustee 22 November 2021 None on record
Steven Kew Trustee 08 February 2018 None on record
Thalia Beckwith Trustee 22 November 2021 None on record
Jessica Welton Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
Caoilfhionn Cubitt Chair 09 February 2016 None on record