THE RED LADDER THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1037653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £153.96k £188.75k £319.92k £395.88k £220.00k
Total expenditure £206.91k £305.25k £312.64k £255.48k £212.93k
Income from government contracts £5.70k £6.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.70k £124.78k £194.82k £289.41k £170.48k