Trustees THE RED LADDER THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Charity number: 1037653
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Bonham | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ceridwen Elizabeth Owen | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Camilla Turzynski | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Brennan | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Lee | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rachel Alexander | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ann Gell | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma McDowell | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Craig D Jefferies | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.