Accounts and annual returns ST AGNES SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1037741
Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 March 2022 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 February 2024 851 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 November 2021 384 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 November 2021 384 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window