Financial history ST AGNES SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1037741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £74.48k £96.00k £48.51k £55.62k £65.09k
Total expenditure £57.21k £89.85k £54.96k £47.74k £43.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.83k £16.50k