THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF TAXATION

Charity number: 1037771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Penelope Ann Louise Tuck Trustee 08 January 2019 None on record
MICHAEL JOHN THEXTON MA FCA CTA Trustee 11 October 2016
PARTNERS IN MEDICAL CARE Received: On time
Charlotte Mary Barbour Trustee 08 January 2019 None on record
Ashley Vimbai Thelma Makoni Trustee 13 April 2021 None on record
PAUL STEPHEN APLIN Trustee 10 October 2017
ROBERT BRUCE BARNES CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
SUSAN MARY HOWARTH Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
PETER CYRIL RAYNEY Chair 05 July 2016 None on record
Nikhil Vasant Mehta Trustee 09 October 2018 None on record
JONATHAN CHARLES RILEY Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
Tracy Ann JACKSON Trustee 19 March 2018 None on record
RAYMOND MCCANN Trustee 10 January 2012 None on record
Jennifer Theresa Rimmer Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
IAN EDWARD HAYES Trustee 16 October 2012 None on record
Joanna Bello-Fuentes Trustee 13 April 2021 None on record
Sarah Hewson Trustee 13 April 2021 None on record
JONATHAN LEONARD ENDACOTT Trustee 05 July 2016
THE CARYLL WENBORN TRUST FUND Received: On time
REVEREND CHANCELLOR HARINGTON FOR CHORISTERS OF EXETER CATHEDRAL Received: On time
BISHOP PHILPOTTS' AND DEAN BOYD'S CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUNDS Received: On time
DEAN BOYD'S CHARITY FOR APPRENTICING Received: On time
REYNOLDS WHALE TRUST FOR ORDINANDS Received: On time
DEAN AND CHAPTER OF EXETER CATHEDRAL SCHOOL PRIZE FUND Received: On time
THE MARY MARRIOTT TRUST Received: On time
BOYD FOR EXHIBITIONS Received: On time
PHILLPOTTS AND BOYD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Muhammad Mobeen-Ul-Anwar Ismail Trustee 13 April 2021 None on record
JOHN EDWARD BARNETT Trustee 18 March 2014
SIXTY-ONE Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN LALLEMAND Trustee 11 January 2011 None on record
Christopher Shrubsole Trustee 13 April 2021 None on record
MOIRA GRACE KELLY Trustee 08 January 2013 None on record
NICHOLA ANNE ROSS MARTIN Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
GARY JAMES ASHFORD Trustee 11 January 2011 None on record
DANIEL FLETCHER LYONS Trustee 11 January 2011 None on record
GLYN WILLIAM FULLELOVE Trustee 18 March 2014 None on record