HEATONS-REDDISH GROUP U3A

Charity number: 1037772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required