HEATONS-REDDISH GROUP U3A

Charity number: 1037772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.14k £9.99k £40.47k £29.74k £12.77k
Total expenditure £7.59k £7.68k £38.57k £29.95k £21.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A