COULSDON AND PURLEY FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A music, speech and drama festival with competence classes for piano, musical instruments, recorder, singers, school choirs, adult choirs etc caters for all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Walter Hanesworth | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HEATH DALTON | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.75k | £6.26k | £15.06k | £14.72k | £18.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.67k | £2.77k | £15.84k | £16.34k | £18.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/06/1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE GENERALLY AND BY MEANS OF THE COMPETITIVE FESTIVAL MOVEMENT IN PARTICULAR, THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC AND DRAMA IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE- COULSDON, PURLEY, CATERHAM, CROYDON, AND PARTS OF SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 KENDALL AVENUE SOUTH
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 0QR
- Phone:
- 02086607939
- Email:
- cpfest.treasurer@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window