Trustees VILLAGE LINK
Charity number: 1038012

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alistair Parker | Chair | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Anderson | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Turner | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Sunderland | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bannister | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anita Parsons | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Pearce | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Hollis | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER MICHAEL DOWELL | Trustee | 13 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIA KATHRINE DOWELL | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.