FOREST HOLME HOSPICE CHARITY

Charity number: 1038021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £620.00k £969.00k £958.00k £782.00k £981.00k
Total expenditure £546.00k £673.00k £742.00k £648.00k £680.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £23.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £377.00k £691.00k £665.00k £498.00k £869.00k
Income - Other trading activities £233.00k £271.00k £262.00k £0 £103.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £23.00k £28.00k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.00k £7.00k £8.00k £10.00k £9.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £246.00k £0
Income - Legacies £57.00k £372.00k £371.00k £151.00k £529.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £365.00k £481.00k £511.00k £463.00k £495.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £181.00k £192.00k £231.00k £185.00k £185.00k
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £476.00k £506.00k £0 £490.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0