Accounts and annual returns 26TH COLCHESTER 1ST SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1038118
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required