Financial history 26TH COLCHESTER 1ST SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1038118
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.89k £12.94k £13.75k £34.79k £7.56k
Total expenditure £10.30k £10.74k £15.08k £6.19k £10.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k N/A