BRIDGNORTH OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE AND GOOD NEIGHBOURS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 February 2017 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required