BRIDGNORTH OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE AND GOOD NEIGHBOURS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.61k £17.16k £18.43k £20.01k £20.14k
Total expenditure £17.49k £16.01k £16.18k £16.07k £17.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £150 N/A N/A